- This is an assessment test.
- These tests focus on the basics of Maths and are meant to indicate your preparation level for the subject.
- Kindly take the tests in this series with a pre-defined schedule.

## Basic Maths: Test 3

Congratulations - you have completed

*Basic Maths: Test 3*.You scored %%SCORE%% out of %%TOTAL%%.You correct answer percentage: %%PERCENTAGE%% .Your performance has been rated as %%RATING%%
Your answers are highlighted below.

Question 1 |

$ \displaystyle \frac{123}{122}$ | |

$ \displaystyle \frac{145}{154}$ | |

$ \frac{205}{146}$ | |

$ \displaystyle \frac{147}{157}$ |

Question 1 Explanation:

We do solve the first half and then we solve the whole question

Question 2 |

If $ \displaystyle x=1+\frac{1}{2+\frac{1}{3+\frac{1}{4+\frac{1}{2}}}}$
Then, the value of $ \displaystyle 2x+\frac{1}{2}$ is

$ \displaystyle 3\frac{49}{134}$ | |

$ \displaystyle 5\frac{13}{24}$ | |

$ \displaystyle 7\frac{13}{24}$ | |

$ \displaystyle 6\frac{23}{134}$ |

Question 2 Explanation:

In this we need the value of x so for value of x we will solve the complex fraction part first .

$ \displaystyle \begin{array}{l}x=1+\frac{1}{2+\frac{1}{3+\frac{1}{4+\frac{1}{2}}}}\\x=1+\frac{1}{2+\frac{1}{3+\frac{2}{9}}}\\x=1+\frac{1}{2+\frac{9}{29}}\\x=1+\frac{29}{67}\\x=96/67\\Now\,by\,\,filling\,\,the\,\,value\,of\,\,x\\we\,\,have\,\,\\2x+\frac{1}{2}=2\times 96/67+\frac{1}{2}\\=\,451/134\,\,=\,\,3\frac{49}{134}\end{array}$

$ \displaystyle \begin{array}{l}x=1+\frac{1}{2+\frac{1}{3+\frac{1}{4+\frac{1}{2}}}}\\x=1+\frac{1}{2+\frac{1}{3+\frac{2}{9}}}\\x=1+\frac{1}{2+\frac{9}{29}}\\x=1+\frac{29}{67}\\x=96/67\\Now\,by\,\,filling\,\,the\,\,value\,of\,\,x\\we\,\,have\,\,\\2x+\frac{1}{2}=2\times 96/67+\frac{1}{2}\\=\,451/134\,\,=\,\,3\frac{49}{134}\end{array}$

Question 3 |

$ \displaystyle 16\times 54\div 18=a$

50 | |

52 | |

44 | |

None |

Question 3 Explanation:

We can simplified the equation as

$ \displaystyle a=16\times \frac{54}{18}$ So the value of a will be 48 hence d is the right answer

$ \displaystyle a=16\times \frac{54}{18}$ So the value of a will be 48 hence d is the right answer

Question 4 |

Find the value of m in
$ \displaystyle 785-m+12\times 11=6295$

-5883 | |

-5793 | |

-5378 | |

-5563 |

Question 4 Explanation:

The equation can be simplified to

$ \displaystyle \begin{array}{l}785-m+12\times 11=6295\\or,\,\,6295+m=785+12\times 11\\m=785+12\times 11-6295\\m=\text{-5378}\end{array}$

Therefore the right answer is option c

$ \displaystyle \begin{array}{l}785-m+12\times 11=6295\\or,\,\,6295+m=785+12\times 11\\m=785+12\times 11-6295\\m=\text{-5378}\end{array}$

Therefore the right answer is option c

Question 5 |

If

$ \displaystyle {{9}^{5.5}}\times {{9}^{y}}={{9}^{9}}$

then find the value of y

$ \displaystyle {{9}^{5.5}}\times {{9}^{y}}={{9}^{9}}$

then find the value of y

4.5 | |

2.29 | |

2.75 | |

none |

Question 5 Explanation:

In case of multiplication if bases are same then the power can be added

So here 5.5 + y =9

From here y = 9 - 5.5 = 3.5

Hence the option d is the right answer â€ƒ

So here 5.5 + y =9

From here y = 9 - 5.5 = 3.5

Hence the option d is the right answer â€ƒ

Once you are finished, click the button below. Any items you have not completed will be marked incorrect.

There are 5 questions to complete.

List |

i think u ve wrong answer of this question no 1………………………………it should be 139/146

Hey Prabhat, check your calculations. The answer seems to be correct in this case. You can post your solution as an image.

sorry made a calculation mistake:P ..its correct

The Answer figure is wrong it should be :

m=785+12Ã—11âˆ’6295

hence, m=-5368