• This is an assessment test.
  • These tests focus on the basics of Maths and are meant to indicate your preparation level for the subject.
  • Kindly take the tests in this series with a pre-defined schedule.

Basic Maths: Test 53

Congratulations - you have completed Basic Maths: Test 53.You scored %%SCORE%% out of %%TOTAL%%.Your performance has been rated as %%RATING%%
Your answers are highlighted below.
Question 1
Rahul's monthly salary is one and a half times Harsh's monthly salary, Nikhil's monthly salary is five-fourth of Rahul's monthly salary. If the total of the monthly salaries of all the three is Rs.1.83,750. what is Nikhil's monthly salary?
A
Rs.42,000
B
Rs.68,500
C
Rs.78,750
D
Rs.63,000
Question 1 Explanation: 
$\begin{align} & Let\,\,\,Harsh's\,\,\,monthly\,\,\,income\,\,be\,\,Rs.\,x. \\ & Rahul's\,\,\,monthly\,\,\,income\,\,=Rs.\,\frac{3x}{2} \\ & Nikhil's\,\,monthly\,\,\,income\,\,=Rs.\,\frac{15x}{8} \\ & Therefore\,\,x+\frac{3x}{2}+\frac{15x}{8}=183750 \\ & \Rightarrow \frac{8x+12x+15x}{8}=183750 \\ & \Rightarrow 35x=183750\times 8 \\ & \Rightarrow x=\frac{183750\times 8}{35}=42000 \\ & Therefore\,\,Nikhil's\,\,\,monthly\,\,\,\,income\, \\ & =Rs.\,\left( \frac{15}{8}\times 42000 \right) \\ & =Rs.78750 \\ \end{align}$
Question 2
$\left( 41\times 71+123\times 23+82\times 25 \right)$ is equal to
A
779000
B
7090
C
7790
D
70900
Question 2 Explanation: 
$\begin{align} & =\left( 41\times 71+123\times 23+82\times 25 \right) \\ & =41\,\left( 71+3\times 23+2\times 25 \right) \\ & =41\,\left( 71+69+50 \right) \\ & =41\times 190=7790 \\ \end{align}$
Question 3
$\left( \frac{3.77\times 3.77\times 3.77-1.77\times 1.77\times 1.77}{3.77\times 3.77+3.77\times 1.77+1.77\times 1.77} \right)$ is equal to
A
−2
B
0.2
C
−0.2
D
2
Question 3 Explanation: 
Let 3.77 = a
And 1.77= b
Therefore expression
$\begin{align} & =\frac{{{a}^{3}}-{{b}^{3}}}{{{a}^{2}}+ab+{{b}^{2}}} \\ & =a-b=3.77-1.77=2.0 \\ \end{align}$
Question 4
$5\frac{2}{71}\times 9\frac{12}{17}\times 12\frac{10}{11}+4\frac{3}{4}=?$
A
603.75
B
635.75
C
634.75
D
605.75
Question 4 Explanation: 
$\begin{align} & ?=\frac{357}{71}\times \frac{165}{17}\times \frac{142}{11}+4.75 \\ & =630+4.75=634.75 \\ \end{align}$
Question 5
Capture
A
386
B
312
C
314
D
320
Question 5 Explanation: 
$\begin{align} & 7512\times \frac{5}{38}\times \frac{95}{100}=?+619 \\ & \Rightarrow 939=?+619 \\ & \Rightarrow ?=939-619=320 \\ \end{align}$
Once you are finished, click the button below. Any items you have not completed will be marked incorrect. Get Results
There are 5 questions to complete.
List
Return
Shaded items are complete.
12345
End
Return

Want to explore more Arithmetic Tests?

Explore Our Arithmetic Tests

Pop Up

LIVE STREAMING ON YOUTUBE

Starting 3rd June 2024, 7pm

Onwards

FREE CHEAT SHEET

Learn
How to Master VA-RC 

This free (and highly detailed) cheat sheet will give you strategies to help you grow

No thanks, I don't want it.

Join our Free TELEGRAM GROUP for exclusive content and updates

Rsz 1rsz Close Img

Join Our Newsletter

Get the latest updates from our side, including offers and free live updates, on email.

Rsz Undraw Envelope N8lc Smal
Rsz 1rsz Close Img